Evaluate 96
x 856 + 9144 x 96.

__Solution__
= 96 x 856 +
9144 x 96

= 96 x (856
+ 9144)

= 96 x
10,000

= 960,000

Hence 96 x
856 + 9144 x 96 = 960,000

__TRY THIS…………__
Evaluate 35
x 745 + 9255 x 35

Evaluate 96
x 856 + 9144 x 96.

= 96 x 856 +
9144 x 96

= 96 x (856
+ 9144)

= 96 x
10,000

= 960,000

Hence 96 x
856 + 9144 x 96 = 960,000

Evaluate 35
x 745 + 9255 x 35

Subscribe to:
Post Comments (Atom)

## No comments:

## Post a Comment